Case: PD-0060-91
PD-0060-91
01/10/1991
PDR Case Type
HAYES, ALVIN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/22/1991 | RESPONSE FILED | State | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/01/1991 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
02/13/1991 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
01/22/1991 | RESPONSE FILED | | |
01/10/1991 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/13/1991 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
HAYES, ALVIN | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | John D. Nation |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John C Vance |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-89-01244-CR
AFF 10-25-90
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
265th District Court
Dallas
Honorable KEITH DEAN
F89-97036-R