Case: B-4700
B-4700
06/11/1974
Application for Writ of Error
SIMONS LAND COMPANY
CITY OF DALLAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/13/1974 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
11/04/1974 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
10/09/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/24/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/11/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/13/1974 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
11/04/1974 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
10/21/1974 | Miscellaneous Motion | Filing granted | | |
10/17/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
10/09/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/24/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/11/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
06/11/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CITY OF DALLAS, ET AL. | Respondent | |
Simons Land Company | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information