Case: 04-99-00498-CR
04-99-00498-CR
07/09/1999
Assault or Attempted Murder
Jesse Paul McBeth
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/04/2000 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
10/02/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/12/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/03/2000 | Submitted | | |
01/03/2000 | Submission | | |
01/03/2000 | Submitted | | |
12/10/1999 | Order Entered | | |
12/10/1999 | Submission | | |
10/27/1999 | Reply brief filed | | |
10/07/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/07/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
10/07/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/08/1999 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
09/08/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
09/08/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
08/11/1999 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/06/1999 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
08/05/1999 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
07/26/1999 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
07/23/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
07/23/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
07/23/1999 | Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed | | |
07/20/1999 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
07/09/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
07/09/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
07/09/1999 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |
07/09/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
07/09/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
07/07/1999 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
07/07/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
07/07/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
07/07/1999 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
07/07/1999 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
07/07/1999 | Clerks Record Received | | |
05/21/1999 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
05/05/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/28/1999 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/02/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Jim Vollers Anton E. Hackebeil |
Jesse Paul Mcbeth | Criminal - Appellant | Adrienne Urrutia |
Trial Court Information
38th Judicial District Court
Uvalde
Honorable Mickey R. Pennington
98-06-9683-CR
4 Years Prob.; $1500 & CC