Case: 04-91-00023-CR
04-91-00023-CR
01/14/1991
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Martinez, Alejandro
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/23/2016 | Internal memo | | |
03/01/2011 | Fee paid | | |
12/02/1993 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/02/1993 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/13/1993 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/13/1993 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/07/1993 | Submitted | | |
09/07/1993 | Submission | | |
09/07/1993 | Submitted | | |
07/21/1993 | Submission | | |
03/30/1993 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/30/1993 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/08/1992 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/30/1992 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
08/05/1992 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/24/1992 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
06/01/1992 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion Granted in Part | |
05/26/1992 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
04/10/1992 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/30/1992 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
01/30/1992 | Order Entered | | |
01/27/1992 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/21/1992 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
01/13/1992 | Brief Filed | | |
12/24/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/17/1991 | Brief Filed | | |
12/17/1991 | Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late) | | |
12/17/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
12/16/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/15/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
09/16/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion Granted in Part | |
09/11/1991 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
07/26/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
07/19/1991 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/15/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
05/30/1991 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/30/1991 | Order Entered | | |
05/23/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
04/18/1991 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/12/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
03/07/1991 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/21/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
02/11/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
02/11/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
01/14/1991 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
01/09/1991 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/14/1990 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/02/2018 | Case Stored | Case archived |
05/23/2016 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Martinez, Alejandro | Criminal - Appellant | Raymond E. Fuchs Alejandro Martinez |
Texas, The State Of | Criminal - State of Texas | Barbara Hervey |
Trial Court Information
186th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable James E. Barlow
89-CR-4906
Life