Case: 03-02-00371-CR
03-02-00371-CR
06/17/2002
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Terry Michael Crum
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/28/2005 | Writ Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
09/21/2005 | Writ of injunction filed | | |||||
06/14/2005 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
05/26/2005 | Case returned from higher court | | |||||
04/27/2005 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by court of criminal appeals | Refused | | ||||
04/01/2005 | Case stored | | |||||
02/07/2005 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
01/27/2005 | Petition for discretionary review received | | |||||
11/08/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
10/13/2004 | Opinion issued but prior opinion not withdrawn. | | |||||
02/27/2004 | Mandate Acknowledgment | | |||||
10/01/2003 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
07/11/2003 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
04/28/2003 | Submitted | | |||||
04/22/2003 | Brief filed | | |||||
03/14/2003 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
03/10/2003 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
03/07/2003 | Correspondence from interested entity | | |||||
02/05/2003 | Brief filed | | |||||
01/06/2003 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
01/06/2003 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
10/23/2002 | Notice received | | |||||
10/14/2002 | Notice of no Court Reporter's Record Recd or Filed | | |||||
10/02/2002 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
08/05/2002 | Docketing statement received | | |||||
06/17/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/01/2003 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
10/01/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Ms. Sally Swanson |
Crum, Terry Michael | Criminal - Appellant | Mr. Bristol C. Myers |
Trial Court Information
299th District Court
Travis
Honorable Fred A. Moore
005450
cnt I-60 yrs; cnt II-20 yrs; cnt IV-60 yrs