Case: B-4722
B-4722
06/18/1974
Application for Writ of Error
JAY U. KIRKMAN, ET AL.
CITY OF AMARILLO, ET AL., STATE OF TEXAS AND COUNTY OF POTTER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/14/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
07/03/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
07/02/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/18/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/24/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
11/14/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
07/03/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/02/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/18/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
06/18/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
City of Amarillo, et al. | Respondent | |
Jay U. Kirkman, et al. | Petitioner | |
State of Texas and County of Potter | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information