Case: 01-98-00165-CR
01-98-00165-CR
02/11/1998
Anders brief filed
Kincy, Nathan Karl aka Kincy, Nathaniel Karl
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/02/1999 | Extension of time to file PDR disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals. | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
11/05/1999 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
11/05/1999 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
09/17/1999 | Motion for Rehearing Due | | |
08/27/1999 | Motion to withdraw as counsel disposed - no new attorney to substitute in as counsel | Grant motion | |
08/27/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
08/27/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
08/17/1999 | Submitted | | |
08/17/1999 | Submission | | |
08/17/1999 | Submitted | | |
07/20/1999 | Case set for submission no oral argument | | |
04/29/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/29/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/14/1999 | Brief Due | | |
03/04/1999 | Motion to withdraw as counsel disposed - no new attorney to substitute in as counsel | Motion will be taken with case | |
02/12/1999 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
02/12/1999 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
02/12/1999 | Order entered | Grant motion | |
11/12/1998 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
07/24/1998 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
07/24/1998 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
07/24/1998 | Motion to withdraw as counsel filed - no new attorney to substitute in as counsel | | |
07/22/1998 | Brief Due | | |
06/22/1998 | Reporter's record filed (statement of facts) | | |
04/02/1998 | Request for time to file reporter's record disposed | Grant motion | |
03/21/1998 | Record due | | |
03/20/1998 | Request filed for additional time to file reporter's record | | |
02/25/1998 | Docketing statement filed | | |
02/11/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
02/06/1998 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |
12/11/1997 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
12/01/1997 | Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21) | | |
11/21/1997 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/05/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
KINCY, NATHAN KARL AKA KINCY, | Criminal - Appellant | Stephen Christopher Taylor |
JUDGE, TRIAL | Trial court judge | |
District Clerk, District | District clerk | |
KINCY, NATHAN KARL AKA KINCY, | PRO SE | Nathaniel Karl Kincy, Pro Se |
REPORTER, COURT | Court reporter | |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Sherry L. Robinson |
Trial Court Information
9th District Court
Waller
Honorable FREDERICK E. EDWARDS
97058926
Life