Case: B-4736
B-4736
06/25/1974
Application for Writ of Error
JIMMIE R. PHAGAN
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/13/1975 | Notice of Appeal filed | Petitioner | | |
12/12/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
07/29/1974 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
07/17/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/25/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/13/1975 | Notice of Appeal filed | | ||
12/13/1974 | Document filed (see remarks) | | ||
12/12/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
07/29/1974 | Reply to Response | | ||
07/17/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/25/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
06/25/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Respondent | |
Jimmie R. Phagan | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information