judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EDWARD TINSLEY V. ANGELA BARKSDALE

Case Information: 10-CV-0740
Short Caption:EDWARD TINSLEY V. ANGELA BARKSDALEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB720-10Filed Date:06/07/2010

Opening Event Date:06/07/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/29/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/07/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEdward Tinsley NPro SeN
AppelleeAngela Barksdale N
Ara D. ParkerNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/07/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/07/2010RECORD INDEX
07/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on June 7, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
07/28/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 4/29/09, 9/28/09, 3/19/10 & 5/13/10) (elp)
10/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (21-pgs/tape 3/19/10 proc.)(Transferred from 09-CV-1496)
10/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (60-pgs/tape 5/13/10 proc.)w/cd (Transferred from 09-CV-1496)
10/29/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/03/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
12/03/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL
12/06/2010TMC - motion for summary reversal - motion to file (LODGED) oppo - response - appellant's motion for sanctions
01/06/2011APPEARANCE - of Ara D. Parker & Joseph D. Richardson on behalf of aple w/ consent letter from supervising attorney
01/06/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to aplt's motion for summary reversal, or in the alternative to timely file a response brief
01/06/2011RECEIVED- aple's response to aplt's motion for summary reversal
01/10/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to appellee's motion to late file (titled as: aplt's response to aplt's motion to late file answer to aplt's motion for summary reversal) LW
02/07/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION FOR SANCTIONS LW
02/18/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to Motion for Sanctions (Titled: Appellee's Response . . . )
03/15/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged opposition/motion for summary affirmance. It is *****MORE*****
03/15/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR REVERSAL
03/15/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL IS DENIED. It is ****MORE****
03/15/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE*****
03/15/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED. It is *****MORE*****
03/15/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is HEREBY AFFIRMED. (RDKRTE) (jl)
03/29/2011APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC
05/13/2011ORDER DENYING APLT PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC (pro se petition) (WHRZGLFIBRTHOBRDKR) (Judge Reid became Associate Judge, Retired, on April 7, 2011. Judge Kramer became Associate Judge, Retired, on May 1, 2011.)
06/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED
08/25/2011FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
11/08/2011FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)