judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WIIDEMAN (RANDAL) VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34699
Short Caption:WIIDEMAN (RANDAL) VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34726
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - CV998741Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/20/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/20/1999Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Emergency Petition for Peremptory Writ of Mandate. 99-07804
10/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from the state, on behalf of respondent: 15 days from the date of this order. 99-09525
10/20/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 99-10259
12/06/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. " . . . we deny the petition." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-12132
01/04/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-00073
01/04/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.