judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUSTIN JOHNSON v. THE CITY OF LARAMIE

Case Heading (S-07-0093)
Case Number:S-07-0093Case Docketed On:04/26/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:DUSTIN JOHNSON v. THE CITY OF LARAMIE
Full Title:DUSTIN JOHNSON, Petitioner, v. THE CITY OF LARAMIE, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDustin JohnsonR. Michael Vang
AppelleeThe City of LaramieAshley C. Schluck
Other Particpants
Interested ObserverThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -DUI
Opinion Number:2008 WY 73
Citation:187 P.3d 355

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/26/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/26/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/26/2007Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
05/23/2007Order - Petition for review - grantOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
07/05/2007Brief - Petitioner; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefPetitionerFinal
08/17/2007Brief - RespondentBriefRespondentFinal
08/24/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/05/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/11/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, one volume, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
06/26/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/14/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/14/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/16/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/15/08 by A. Yother.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal