judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

LUCILLE E. BYARS v. T. B. BYARS, ET AL.

Case: A-146
A-146
04/17/1944
Application for Writ of Error
LUCILLE E. BYARS
T. B. BYARS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/24/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/26/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
04/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/14/1944Motion to Amend Filed
06/24/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/05/1944Bond
05/03/1944Document received (See Remarks)
04/26/1944Response to Petition
04/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/17/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lucille E. ByarsPetitioner
T. B. Byars, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information