Case: 00-1078
00-1078
10/16/2000
Second Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
BYRON MOSS and FRANK MOSS
BURLESON STATE BANK
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/31/2001 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Burleson State Bank's response to petition for reviewSequence #: 02 | |
12/21/2000 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | appendix attachedSequence #: 02 | |
12/21/2000 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Burleson State Bank n/k/a First State Bank of TexasSequence #: 02 | |
11/15/2000 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | appendix attachedSequence #: 01 | |
11/15/2000 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Byron & Frank MossSequence #: 01 | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/17/2001 | Case Stored | G02/20-C-3 | | |
04/18/2001 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order mailed to the Court of Appeals. | | |
02/15/2001 | Petition for Review disposed | Two applications for writ of error denied. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
02/15/2001 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | On behalf of Burleson State Bank.Sequence #: 02 | |
02/15/2001 | Petition for Review disposed | Two applications for writ of error denied. | On behalf of Byron Moss and Frank Moss. | |
01/31/2001 | Response to Petition | Burleson State Bank's response to petition for reviewSequence #: 02 | | |
01/02/2001 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response due Thurs., 2/1/01 | | |
12/21/2000 | Appendix Filed | appendix attachedSequence #: 02 | | |
12/21/2000 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Burleson State Bank n/k/a First State Bank of TexasSequence #: 02 | | |
12/05/2000 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
11/28/2000 | Response Waiver filed | On behalf of Burleson State Bank n/k/a First State Bank of TexasSequence #: 02 | | |
11/15/2000 | Appendix Filed | appendix attachedSequence #: 01 | | |
11/15/2000 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Byron & Frank MossSequence #: 01 | | |
10/17/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | m/e/t to file petition for review was granted; petition is due 11-15-00 | |
10/17/2000 | Petition due | petition for review is due November 15, 2000. | | |
10/16/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | On behalf of Byron Moss and Frank Moss | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/17/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Location G02/20-C-3 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
PLUNKETT, DONNA | Other interested party | Mr. Cecil R. Miskin |
MOSS, BYRON | Petitioner | Mr. Kevin S. Marshall |
FIRST STATE BANK OF TEXAS | Respondent | Mr. Bruce W. McGee Mr. Allen D. Wright |
BURLESSON STATE BANK | Respondent | Ms. Michelle McCoy Monger |
PLUNKETT, BURT | Other interested party | Mr. Cecil R. Miskin |
MOSS, FRANK | Petitioner | Mr. William G. Mason Mr. Kevin S. Marshall |
Court of Appeals Information:
10-98-00036-CV
Affirmed/Rev'd & Rend'd
27 SW3d 605, 08-30-00
10th Court of Appeals
Honorable Tom W. Gray
Trial Court Information
249th District Court
Johnson
Honorable Dennis W. Bridewell
249-86-96