judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TEXAS LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. EUGENE SAMUEL UTZMAN

Case: A-131
A-131
04/04/1944
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
EUGENE SAMUEL UTZMAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/02/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/12/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
04/04/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/17/1944Order from Lower Court filed
05/05/1944Response to Motion filed
05/02/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/12/1944Response to Petition
04/04/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
04/04/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Eugene Samuel UtzmanRespondent
Texas Life Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information