judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUTLER (ROBERT) VS. WASHOE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY C/W 36543/36963

Case Information: 34713
Short Caption:BUTLER (ROBERT) VS. WASHOE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY C/W 36543/36963Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:34713*, 36543 , 36963
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR990476Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/12/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/24/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07890
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34429, 34579, 34587, 34683, 34696, 34700, 34713, 34762. 99-09650
11/12/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 3. Mailed on 11/10/99. 99-11195
11/12/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Certified copy of the complete trial court record in district court case number CR990476 as a supplemental record on appeal due: 30 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-10269
06/22/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 01-10583
07/31/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We again caution appellant that continued frivolous filings may result in referral for the forfeiture of statutory good time credits. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB. Nos. 34713/36543/36963 01-12939
08/28/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13051
08/28/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/04/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 30, 2001. 01-13051