judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN RION v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-179)
Case Number:06-179Case Docketed On:08/01/2006
Linked To: 06-178
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:JOHN RION v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOHN RION, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohn RionRaymond D. Macchia
Edward J. Battitori
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 197
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/01/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/01/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/01/2006Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
08/10/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance for Raymond D. Macchia to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
09/11/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/11/2006Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
09/12/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/12/2006Order - Pro hac vice - allowing Edward J. Battitori to appear on behalf of appellantOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
09/14/2006Motion - Withdrawal of counsel P.M. "Mike" RobertsMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
09/14/2006Order - Grant motion to withdraw of counselOrderGrantFinal
10/03/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/05/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/07/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/07/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
12/14/2006Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
12/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - fourthOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/03/2007Order - Remand - Calene (Sixty day remand)OrderRemand - CaleneFinal
01/29/2007Motion - Extension of time - other- to hold evidentiary hearing in district courtMotionExtension of time - otherFinal
02/06/2007Order - Granting extension of time to complete partial remand until 05/04/07OrderGrantFinal
05/08/2007System - Status check - remand - called district court to check status of Calene hearing. Hearing has been held and an order entered. Requested copy of order.SystemStatus check - remandFinal
05/09/2007Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - received copy of decision letter, however, no order has been filed yet.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
05/15/2007Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order on remand - Received order upon evidentiary hearing.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder on remandFinal
05/17/2007Order - Other lifting stay and setting briefing schedule for appellantOrderOtherFinal
06/13/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/14/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/26/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant, sixth requestMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/27/2007Order - Denying appellant's request for extension of time to file briefOrderDenyFinal
07/17/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on cd.BriefAppellantFinal
08/24/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppelleeFinal
08/29/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/12/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/14/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder; Volume IV, exhibits; Volume V, exhibits (this is a combined volume with 06-178).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/13/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court. Justice Hill filed a specially concurring opinion in which Justice Kite joinedOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/31/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/31/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/31/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/31/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/03/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal