Case: 05-95-01424-CV
05-95-01424-CV
10/09/1995
Miscellaneous civil
R.O. Evans Pontiac - GMC Company
Durham, Ronald
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/24/2017 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
06/06/2016 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
11/20/1997 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||
09/12/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |||
09/12/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |||
07/02/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
07/02/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
01/29/1997 | Submitted | | |||
01/29/1997 | Submission | | |||
01/29/1997 | Submitted | | |||
12/31/1996 | MattConv | | |||
09/24/1996 | Letter Filed | | |||
06/25/1996 | Letter Filed | | |||
03/07/1996 | Letter Filed | | |||
02/12/1996 | Brief Filed |
| |||
02/12/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |||
02/12/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |||
02/10/1996 | MattConv | | |||
01/16/1996 | Brief Filed | | |||
01/16/1996 | MattConv | | |||
01/05/1996 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/28/1995 | MattConv | | |||
12/14/1995 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
11/30/1995 | MattConv | | |||
11/28/1995 | Exhibits Filed | | |||
11/28/1995 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
11/16/1995 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/15/1995 | MattConv | | |||
10/31/1995 | ADR Referral Order Issued | Referred to Mediation | | ||
10/30/1995 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |||
10/20/1995 | MattConv | | |||
10/17/1995 | Record due | | |||
10/16/1995 | Transcript Filed | | |||
10/09/1995 | Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellant | | |||
10/09/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
09/15/1995 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |||
07/19/1995 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |||
06/19/1995 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/24/2017 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
R.o. Evans Pontiac - Gmc Compa | Appellant | Kip H. Allison Dan A. Atkerson |
Durham, Ronald | Appellee | Jeffrey L. Clark |
Trial Court Information
160th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable David C. Godbey
93-11711-H