judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

E. V. LEE v. TEXAS GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case: B-7997
B-7997
10/23/1978
Application for Writ of Error
E. V. LEE
TEXAS GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/14/1978Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/07/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
10/23/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/06/1979Opinion issued
12/21/1978Response to Motion filed
12/14/1978Motion for Rehearing
11/07/1978Response to Petition
10/23/1978Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/23/1978Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas General Indemnity CompanyRespondent
E. V. LeePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information