Case: B-8001
B-8001
10/24/1978
Application for Writ of Error
SOUTHERN FARM BUREAU CASUALITY
JAMES R. ADAMS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/21/1979 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
10/31/1978 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/25/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
10/24/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/05/1979 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/21/1979 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
10/31/1978 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/25/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
10/25/1978 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/24/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
James R. Adams, et al. | Respondent | |
Southern Farm Bureau Casuality | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information