Case: B-7995
B-7995
10/23/1978
Application for Writ of Error
TOM BENSON CHEVWAY RENTAL AND LEASING INC.
KENNETH WAYNE ALLEN, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/09/1979 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
12/21/1978 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
11/21/1978 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/23/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/09/1979 | Reply to Response | | ||
01/08/1979 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
12/21/1978 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/21/1978 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/23/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
10/23/1978 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Kenneth Wayne Allen, et ux. | Respondent | |
Tom Benson Chevway Rental and Leasing Inc. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information