judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BAGNASACCO VS. ESTATE OF BAGNASACCO

Case Information: 34701
Short Caption:BAGNASACCO VS. ESTATE OF BAGNASACCOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A396601Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/27/1999 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/04/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Evans & Associates--check no. 2919.
08/23/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07827
08/23/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
08/27/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/30/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 8/26/99. 99-08108
10/21/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 30, 1999. 99-10316
01/12/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-00524
01/20/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Re: change of address for Frances-Ann Fine, Esq. 00-00922
01/24/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-01078
02/08/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/9/99. To Court Reporter: Christine Cornelius. 00-01994
02/08/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-01995
03/03/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 9, 1999. Court Reporter: Sherry Robinson. 00-03389
05/22/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 5/19/00. 00-08475
05/22/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-08477
06/26/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 6/21/00. 00-10888
06/26/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-10889
07/27/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 7/25/00. 00-13046
10/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-17681
10/05/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/04/2001Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Panel: SNP02-CY/DA/ML.
11/09/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-18786
12/05/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19160
12/05/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2001. 01-19160