judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARCO PEDRO LEMUS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-68)
Case Number:06-68Case Docketed On:03/27/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MARCO PEDRO LEMUS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARCO PEDRO LEMUS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMarco Pedro LemusKaren Ashcraft Byrne
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/27/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/27/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/27/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance. Daniel Blythe on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
04/14/2006Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
04/14/2006Order granting leave for counsel with withdraw. Public Defender allowed to withdraw.OrderOtherFinal
05/10/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/11/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/15/2006Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from appellant with various "motions".CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/16/2006Correspondence - Outgoing. Sent letter to appellant in response to his letter and motions, copied to Dan Blythe.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
06/02/2006Motion - Other. Filed "motion to Wyoming Supreme Court" regarding firing counsel; and filed "motion to Wyoming Supreme Court" regarding telephone conference about counsel.MotionOtherFinal
06/06/2006Correspondence - Incoming other. Received copies of various letter and "evidence." No actions necessary.CorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal
06/15/2006Order - Denying motions.OrderDenyFinal
06/23/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/26/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/11/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/14/2006Notice-Incoming - copy of designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
09/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/06/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/07/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/14/2006Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
11/14/2006Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance. Karen A. Byrne on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
11/15/2006Order - Withdrawal of counsel. (Daniel G. Blythe allowed to withdraw and Karen A. Byrne substituted as counsel for appellant)OrderOtherFinal
12/04/2006Correspondence - Incoming other. Received "Motion to Wyoming Supreme Court" requesting copies of briefs, extensions and exhibits.CorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal
12/05/2006Correspondence - Outgoing. Sent letter to appellant regarding briefs and copies.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
12/19/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/20/2006Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter and packet of information from appellant regarding his appeal and the records.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
12/22/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
12/22/2006Correspondence - Outgoing. Sent letter to appellant regarding the brief and evidence not admitted at trial. (Letter prepared before extension of time entered - sent copy of order extending time to file brief to appellant).CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
12/22/2006Event - Phone Call. Received phone call from appellant regarding materials sent to the court. Explained to appellant that no new evidence, etc., could be considered by this court.EventPhone CallFinal
01/25/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/30/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief. Motion for continuance of time to file reply brief.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/31/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/01/2007Order - Grant - extension of time to file reply brief.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/21/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel; and submitted proposed order.MotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
02/22/2007Event - Phone Call. Received phone call from Mike Causey. He stated that they had received copy of motion to withdraw and are not planning on objecting or responding. He also wanted us to know that Mr. Lemus is not serving them with pleadings, so if we act on any of his pleadings to let him know.EventPhone CallFinal
02/22/2007Order - Grant - extension of time to file reply brief.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/22/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief. Motion for continuance of time to file reply brief.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/06/2007Order - Deny. Order denying motion to withdraw as counsel.OrderDenyFinal
03/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, ten volumes. Volumes I-VI, original papers; volumes VII-IX, transcripts; volume X, transcripts & exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
03/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Karen A. Byrne for appellant; James Michael Causey, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/13/2007Correspondence - Incoming. Received correspondence from appellant regarding arguments in his brief, with attachment.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
04/13/2007Correspondence - Outgoing. Responded to appellant indicating that the court may not consider things not in the record, or briefed by his counsel.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
04/24/2007Event - Phone Call. Received call from appellant re additional evidence. Told him that this court does not take additional evidence, it will only consider the trial court record. He is sending his packet of information to the Department of Justice.EventPhone CallFinal
05/02/2007Correspondence - Incoming- received letters from Mr. Lemus regarding the record and his counsel. No response or action taken.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/08/2007Motion - Other - "A 3 page letter of 4 motions to the Wyoming Supreme Court."MotionOtherFinal
06/08/2007Correspondence - Outgoing - sent letter to appellant regarding his 3 page letter of 4 motions.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
07/17/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/02/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/06/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for on 8/3/07 by Kenneth Roberts.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal