judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

GULF INSURANCE COMPANY AND REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY, AETNA INSURANCE COMPANY AND HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, GULF INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL. v. JESSE JAMES, STATE TREASURER, ET AL.

Case: A-139
A-139
04/15/1944
Application for Writ of Error
GULF INSURANCE COMPANY AND REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY, AETNA INSURANCE COMPANY AND HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, GULF INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL.
JESSE JAMES, STATE TREASURER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/14/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/14/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
09/25/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
09/12/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/21/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/15/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/10/1945Letter Filed
03/14/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/14/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/20/1944Bond
10/18/1944Document received (See Remarks)
09/25/1944Brief in Support of Petition
09/12/1944Brief in Support of Petition
06/21/1944Motion for RehearingFiling granted
04/15/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
04/15/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gulf Insurance Company, et al.Petitioner
Jesse James, State Treasurer, et al.Respondent
Gulf Insurance Company and Republic Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Aetna Insurance Company and Hartford Accident and Indemnity CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information