Case: B-8011
B-8011
10/30/1978
Application for Writ of Error
CANARLICE HOLMES
O. C. OLSON DBA SOUTHERN INVESTMENT CO.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/09/1979 | Letter brief | Petitioner | | |
12/27/1978 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
11/16/1978 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/30/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/30/1979 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/03/1979 | Opinion issued | | ||
03/09/1979 | Letter brief | | ||
12/27/1978 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
11/16/1978 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/30/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Gulf Coast Legal Foundation | Amicus Curiae | |
Canarlice Holmes | Petitioner | |
O. C. Olson dba Southern Investment Co. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information