Case: 05-98-00430-CV
05-98-00430-CV
03/11/1998
Consumer protection/DTPA
Fred O. Delin
Comerica Bank - Texas, Successor to Northpark National Bank of Dallas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/21/2017 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
12/22/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
08/05/1998 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
07/31/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |||
07/31/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |||
07/10/1998 | Record due | | |||
06/10/1998 | Record due | | |||
05/27/1998 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
05/27/1998 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
05/26/1998 | Submitted | | |||
05/26/1998 | Submission | | |||
05/26/1998 | Submitted | | |||
05/15/1998 | Letter Filed | | |||
05/14/1998 | Letter Filed | | |||
04/30/1998 | Settle/Not Settle - ADR Report Due | | |||
04/14/1998 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
04/14/1998 | Letter Filed | | |||
04/10/1998 | Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate | | |||
03/31/1998 | ADR Referral Order Issued | | |||
03/17/1998 | Supplemental Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
03/12/1998 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |||
03/11/1998 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |||
03/11/1998 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
03/11/1998 | Docketing Statement Received | | |||
03/11/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
03/11/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
03/11/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
02/10/1998 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/21/2017 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Liesa Kliman | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Liesa Kliman |
Judge | Judge - Trial Court | Dallas District Judge, 95th District Court |
Fred O. Delin | Appellant | Eric W. Buether Mr. Christopher Michael Joe |
Comerica Bank - Texas | Appellee | W. Mike Baggett Lindy D. Jones Tonya P. Johannsen |
Sandra Hughes | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Sandra Hughes |
District Clerk | District Clerk | District Clerk |
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Sally Montgomery
92-15232-D