Case: 03-98-00121-CV
03-98-00121-CV
03/12/1998
Administrative law
Harlandale Independent School District and The Board of Trustees of Harlandale Independent School District
The Central Education Agency, Mike Moses and Ramon Guzman
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/15/2012 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||||
10/05/2000 | Case stored | | |||||
11/03/1999 | Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk | | |||||
05/25/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
03/04/1999 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded |
| ||||
01/27/1999 | Submitted | | |||||
01/27/1999 | Submission | | |||||
01/22/1999 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
01/08/1999 | Oral argument acknowledged | | |||||
12/18/1998 | Oral argument acknowledged | | |||||
12/18/1998 | Oral argument acknowledged | | |||||
12/14/1998 | Submission | | |||||
12/01/1998 | Reply brief filed | | |||||
11/10/1998 | Extension to file reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
11/09/1998 | Response to Motion | | |||||
11/06/1998 | Extension to file reply brief | | |||||
09/28/1998 | Brief filed | | |||||
09/25/1998 | Brief filed | | |||||
09/25/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
08/28/1998 | Amended brief filed | | |||||
08/28/1998 | Brief received, not filed | | |||||
08/05/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/31/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
06/22/1998 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
06/22/1998 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
06/09/1998 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
03/30/1998 | Staff recommendation for mediation | No for mediation | | ||||
03/26/1998 | Docketing statement received | | |||||
03/18/1998 | Docketing statement to appellant's counsel | | |||||
03/12/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
03/12/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/25/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Guzman, Ramon | Appellee | Ms. Elizabeth Colvin Ms. Martha P. Owen The Honorable Dan Morales Mr. George A. Warner |
Harlandale Independent School | Appellant | Mr. Tony Resendez Mr. Bobby J. Ramirez Mr. Juan J. Cruz |
The Board Of Trustees Of The H | Appellant | Mr. Juan J. Cruz Mr. Bobby J. Ramirez Mr. Tony Resendez |
Moses, Mike | Appellee | Mr. George A. Warner The Honorable Dan Morales Ms. Martha P. Owen |
The Central Education Agency | Appellee | The Honorable Dan Morales Mr. George A. Warner Ms. Martha P. Owen |
Trial Court Information
261st District Court
Travis
Honorable Mary C Williams
97-00936