Case: B-7984
B-7984
10/18/1978
Application for Writ of Error
NELSON BUNKER HUNT, HERBERT HUNT AND LAMAR HUNT
COASTAL STATES GAS PRODUCING COMPANY AND COASTAL STATES MARKETING, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/08/1980 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
10/18/1979 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | | |
10/18/1979 | Writ of Certiorari filed | Petitioner | | |
07/16/1979 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
06/28/1979 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/27/1979 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
03/14/1979 | Letter brief | Petitioner | | |
03/12/1979 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
12/08/1978 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
11/02/1978 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/01/1978 | Response to Petition | Petitioner | | |
10/18/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Respondent | | |
10/18/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/23/1981 | Miscellaneous Motion | Filing granted | | |
01/08/1980 | Motion for Rehearing | Denied | | |
12/17/1979 | Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed. | | ||
10/31/1979 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
10/18/1979 | Appendix Filed | | ||
10/18/1979 | Writ of Certiorari filed | | ||
08/08/1979 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
07/31/1979 | Motion for emergency stay filed | Filing granted | | |
07/16/1979 | Reply to Response | | ||
07/06/1979 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/28/1979 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/27/1979 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/13/1979 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
06/13/1979 | Opinion issued | | ||
03/14/1979 | Letter brief | | ||
03/12/1979 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
03/06/1979 | Motion to Amend Filed | | ||
02/17/1979 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/07/1979 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/07/1979 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/07/1979 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/07/1979 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/07/1979 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/07/1979 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/07/1979 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/07/1979 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/07/1979 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/07/1979 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/07/1979 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/08/1978 | Reply to Response | | ||
11/02/1978 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/01/1978 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/18/1978 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/18/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
10/18/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Coastal States Gas Producing Company and Coastal States Marketing, Inc. | Respondent | |
Nelson Bunker Hunt, Herbert Hunt and Lamar Hunt | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information