Case: B-7954
B-7954
10/05/1978
Application for Writ of Error
J. ROBERT METZGER AND UNITED SALES INC.
JAMES E. BASS, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/23/1979 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
11/01/1978 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/05/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/31/1979 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
01/23/1979 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/01/1978 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/16/1978 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Filing granted | | |
10/05/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
10/05/1978 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
J. Robert Metzger and United Sales Inc. | Petitioner | |
James E. Bass, Jr. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information