judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRYAN EDWARD HUMPHREY v. DEBRA KAY HUMPHREY

Case Heading (06-155)
Case Number:06-155Case Docketed On:07/05/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:BRYAN EDWARD HUMPHREY v. DEBRA KAY HUMPHREY
Full Title:BRYAN EDWARD HUMPHREY, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DEBRA KAY HUMPHREY, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBryan Edward HumphreyW. Keith Goody
AppelleeDebra Kay HumphreyLea Jacobs Kuvinka

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 72
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/05/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/05/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/05/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/05/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/07/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/18/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
09/25/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/03/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/03/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/17/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal; three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/31/2006Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court, Exhibit NN. Included in Volume III, with other exhibitsNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/30/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/16/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/16/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal