judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NATALIE KIMBERLY KHAWAM V. GRAYSON PAUL WOLFE

Case Information: 10-FM-0744
Short Caption:NATALIE KIMBERLY KHAWAM V. GRAYSON PAUL WOLFEClassification:Appeals - Family - Custody
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB921-09Filed Date:06/14/2010

Opening Event Date:06/14/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/23/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNatalie Kimberly KhawamNPro SeN
AppelleeGrayson Paul Wolfe, IIN
Faith D. Dornbrand NN
Sandra G. WilkofNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/28/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER. See DC Code 11-721 (2001). (BY: ETW)
06/28/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC - motion to file LODGED (AMENDED ROTSC) - appellee's opposition - appellee's motion to strike amended response
07/06/2010APPEARANCE of Sandra Wilkof as counsel for aple.
07/08/2010LETTER received from appellee's counsel regarding DCCA order dated June 28, 2010
07/19/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - order dated 6/28/10
07/26/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to amend response to show cause order
07/27/2010RECEIVED - aplt's amended response to court's order to show cause
07/28/2010RECEIVED - aple's response to aplt response to show cause order.
07/29/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE - aplt's amended response to order to show cause and opposition to aplt's motion for leave to amend response.
08/10/2010RECEIVED - aplt's reply to aple's response to order to show cause
09/02/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE appellant's amended response IS DENIED AS MOOT. It is ****MORE****
09/02/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO FILE the amended response IS DENIED. It is *****MORE*****
09/02/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED W/O PREJUDICE as having been taken from non-final orders. See DC Code 11-721 (2001);...SEE HARDCOPY (KRBRNB) (kt)
09/02/2010DISMISSED
09/23/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived