judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID B. STEWART v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (06-154)
Case Number:06-154Case Docketed On:06/30/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:DAVID B. STEWART v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:DAVID B. STEWART, Appellant (Employee/Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Objector/Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid B. StewartDavid M. Gosar
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Kristi Marie Radosevich
Steven R. Czoschke

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 58
Citation:155 P.3d 198

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/30/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/30/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/30/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/14/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/01/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/27/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/02/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/30/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
11/07/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/20/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/01/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, Agency Record; Volume II, Transcript (Letter from District Court Clerk states that no original district court pleadings are being transmitted, copies are attached to appellant's brief)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/11/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/16/2007Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellant; received insufficient number of copiesEventPhone CallFinal
04/18/2007Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
05/08/2007Order - Other - awarding attorney's fees and costsOrderOtherFinal
05/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/08/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal