judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THOMAS CUNNINGHAM V. OLIVIA CUNNINGHAM

Case Information: 10-FM-0743
Short Caption:THOMAS CUNNINGHAM V. OLIVIA CUNNINGHAMClassification:Appeals - Family - Support
Lead: 10-FM-0742 Consolidated:10-FM-0743
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PCS985-09Filed Date:06/04/2010

Opening Event Date:06/04/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/20/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThomas Cunningham YPro SeN
AppelleeOlivia Cunningham NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/04/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/28/2010 ORDERED, SS, that APPEALS NOS. 10FM742 and 10FM743 are HEREBY CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES. It is *****MORE*****
06/28/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why these appeals should not be dismissed in light of the waiver of appeal filed. (BY: ETW)
06/28/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
07/19/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
07/29/2010 ORDERED that THESE APPEALS ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. (GLOBKN) (cb)
07/29/2010DISMISSED
08/20/2010MANDATE ISSUED
09/02/2010RECEIVED - SR #1 (90pgs/Tape) 5/21/10 proc. w/CD included
04/18/2014FiledArchived