judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEE VS. WYOMING RESTAURANTS

Case Information: 34702
Short Caption:LEE VS. WYOMING RESTAURANTSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A401337Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/27/1999 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kerr & Associates--check no. 6472.
08/23/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07830
08/27/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/01/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 6/28/99; 8/16/99. To Court Reporter: Carrie Hansen. 99-08219
12/30/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-13424
12/30/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-13425
01/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK 00-00740
01/18/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.