Case: B-7966
B-7966
10/11/1978
MISC PETITION
CHARLIE CASE, ET AL.
HON. DEE BROWN WALKER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/27/1978 | Motion for Rehearing | Intervenor | | |
11/27/1978 | Brief in Support of Petition | Respondent | | |
11/27/1978 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
10/25/1978 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
10/25/1978 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/25/1978 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/25/1978 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | Relator | | |
10/24/1978 | Supplement to Petition filed | Relator | | |
10/20/1978 | Brief in Support of Petition | Intervenor | | |
10/11/1978 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | Relator | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/06/1978 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
11/27/1978 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/27/1978 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
11/27/1978 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/08/1978 | Opinion issued | | ||
10/31/1978 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
10/30/1978 | Motion to dismiss | | ||
10/25/1978 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
10/25/1978 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/25/1978 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/25/1978 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
10/25/1978 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
10/24/1978 | Supplement to Petition filed | | ||
10/20/1978 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
10/20/1978 | Motion to intervene | | ||
10/20/1978 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
10/11/1978 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
10/11/1978 | Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus | Filing granted | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Grayson County Officials | Intervenor | |
Hon. Dee Brown Walker | Respondent | |
Charlie Case, et al. | Relator |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information