judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FRAZIER ESCO v. ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case: A-11729
A-11729
10/14/1966
Application for Writ of Error
FRAZIER ESCO
ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
01/02/1967Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/15/1966Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/01/1966Response to PetitionRespondent
10/14/1966Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
01/02/1967Reply to Response
12/19/1966Response to Motion filed
12/15/1966Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/01/1966Response to Petition
10/14/1966Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/14/1966Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Frazier EscoPetitioner
ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANYRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information