judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STRICKLAND (JOHN) VS. DIRECTOR

Case Information: 34709
Short Caption:STRICKLAND (JOHN) VS. DIRECTORCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC9811025Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/10/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/24/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07877
08/24/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-07911
08/27/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-08036
09/13/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-08606
09/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 99-09416
11/09/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: December 9, 1999. 99-11068
12/09/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-12368
12/21/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The appellant's opening brief and appendix shall b served and filed on or before January 10, 2000. 99-12975
01/10/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 1/10/00. 00-00349
02/09/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 2/9/00. 00-02092
03/10/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 3/10/00. 00-03833
03/10/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-09757
07/10/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10317
07/10/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/30/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2001. 01-10317