judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THE STATE OF WYOMING v. CAMPBELL COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT, STATE OF WYOMING, et al., LARAMIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE, et al.; WYOMING EDUCATION ASSOCIATION; WYOMING SCHOOL BOARD ASSOCIATION, BIG HORN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE, et al.

Case Heading (06-75)
Case Number:06-75Case Docketed On:04/06/2006
Linked To: 06-74
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Education (Title 21)
Short Title:THE STATE OF WYOMING v. CAMPBELL COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT, STATE OF WYOMING, et al., LARAMIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE, et al.; WYOMING EDUCATION ASSOCIATION; WYOMING SCHOOL BOARD ASSOCIATION, BIG HORN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE, et al.
Full Title:THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellant (Defendant), v. CAMPBELL COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT, STATE OF WYOMING, et al., Appellees (Plaintiffs), LARAMIE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE, et al.; WYOMING EDUCATION ASSOCIATION; WYOMING SCHOOL BOARD ASSOCIATION, Appellees (Intervening Plaintiffs), BIG HORN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. ONE, et al., Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThe State of WyomingMichael R. O'Donnell
Rhonda Sigrist Woodard
AppelleeCampbell County School DistrictFord T. Bussart
Marvin L. Tyler
AppelleeTeton County School District No. 1Sara E. Van Genderen
AppelleeNatrona School District No. 1Kathleen Baker Dixon
Stefanie Lee Boster
AppelleeBig Horn County School District No. 1Timothy J. Kirven
Benjamin Scott Kirven
IntervenorLaramie County School District No. 1Paul J. Hickey
Richard D. Bush
IntervenorWyoming Education AssociationPatrick E. Hacker
Gregory Patrick Hacker
Erin Maureen Kendall
IntervenorWyoming School Board AssociationTracy J. Copenhaver

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2008 WY 2
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/06/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/06/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/03/2006Motion - Other. Motion requesting exception to rule 1.01(c), Wyoming Rules of Appellate Procedure.MotionOtherFinal
05/03/2006Motion - Stay -other. Motion for stay of enforcement of judgment.MotionStay - otherFinal
05/03/2006Memorandum - In support of motion. Memorandum of points and authorities.MemorandumIn support of motionFinal
05/04/2006Motion - Other. Supplement to motion for stay of enforcement of judgment.MotionOtherFinal
05/10/2006Response/Objection - Motion. Response to appellant, State of Wyoming's motion for stay of enforcement of judgment. (Wyoming School Boards Association & Campbell County School District, et al.)Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/18/2006Response/Objection - Motion. Appellees' response to motion requesting exception to rule 1.01(c), Wyoming Rules of Appellate Procedure. (Big Horn County School District No. 1, et al.)Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/18/2006Response/Objection - Motion. State of Wyoming's reply to appellees' response to motion requesting exception to rule 1.01(c), Wyoming Rules of Appellate Procedure.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/22/2006Brief - Appellant, State of Wyoming; proposed electronic brief of State of Wyoming in flash-drive format with hyper-linking technology; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
05/22/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
05/26/2006Notice-Internal - Recusal memo. Justice Burke recused.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
05/26/2006Notice-Internal - Recusal memo. Chief Justice Hill recused.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
05/30/2006Order - Grant. Order granting motion requesting exception to W.R.A.P. 1.01(c)OrderGrantFinal
06/01/2006Notice-Incoming - Other. Instructions for use of USB flash drive.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/02/2006Order - Assignment of judge. Chief Justice Hill and Justice Burke recused and assigning District Judge Jeffrey A. Donnell and District Judge Norman E. Young to act in this matter.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
06/02/2006Order - Assignment of judge. Chief Justice Hill and Justice Burke recused and assigning District Judge Jeffrey A. Donnell and District Judge Norman E. Young to act in this matter.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
06/05/2006Motion - Admission pro hac vice. Motion pro hac vice and entry of appearance as local counsel.MotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
06/05/2006Motion - Amicus - leave to participate. Motion to file brief as amici curiae; and received proposed brief of amici curiae. (Northern Arapaho Tribe and Wyoming Parent Teacher Association)MotionAmicus - leave to participateFinal
06/06/2006Order - Grant. Order granting motion for stay of enforcement of judgment.OrderGrantFinal
06/06/2006Order - Grant. Order granting motion to enlarge time for oral argument. (two hours total)OrderGrantFinal
06/10/2006Notice-Incoming - Change of address. (Kathleen B. Dixon)Notice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
06/20/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/23/2006Motion - Clarification. State's motion for clarification of stay.MotionClarificationFinal
07/10/2006Response/Objection - Motion. Response of WSBA, Campbell County School District, Sweetwater County School District No. 1, Sweetwater County School District No. 2, and Uinta County School District No. 1, to state's motion for clarification of stay.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
07/11/2006Response/Objection - Reply. State's reply to response regarding motion for clarification of stay.Response/ObjectionReplyFinal
07/18/2006Order - Granting motion to clarify stay.OrderGrantFinal
08/03/2006Brief - Appellee Wyoming School Boards AssociationBriefAppelleeFinal
08/07/2006Brief - Appellee Big Horn School District No. One, et al; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
08/09/2006Brief - Appellee, Laramie County School District No. One; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
08/10/2006Brief - Appellee Teton County School District No. 1; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
08/10/2006Brief - Appellees Wyoming Education Association and Campbell County School District, Sweetwater County School District No. 1, Sweetwater County School District No. 2, and Uinta County School District No. 1; and received copy of brief on cd.BriefAppelleeFinal
08/11/2006Brief - Appellee (intervening plaintiff) Natrona County School District Number One. (one day late - untimely filed)BriefAppelleeFinal
08/21/2006Notice-Incoming - Change of address (Stefanie L. Boster)Notice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
08/25/2006Brief - Appellant reply, State of WyomingBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/28/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/06/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, sixty-four volumes. Volumes I-XVIII, original papers; volume XIX, second amended final exhibit list; volumes XX-XXXIV, transcripts; volumes XXXV-XXXI, exhibits; volume XXXII, original Supreme Court record from first appeal; volumes XXXXIII-XXXXVII, original Supreme Court record from second appeal; volumes XXXXVIII-LXIV, transcripts, dispositions and exhibits from original first and second appeals to Supreme Court. *NOTE: designated index dated August 31, 2006 does not match original index dated March 31, 2006 as pleadings are in different volumes than cited on briefs. Per Chief Justice Voigt, the record is not to be returned to Clerk of District Court for correction.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/12/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/08/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden and Kite, and DJJ's Donnell and Young (Tracy J. Copenhaver, Richard D. Bush, Sara E. Van Genderen, Kathleen B. Dixon, Ford T. Bussart, Marvin L. Tyler, Patrick E. Hacker, Gregory P. Hacker, and Timothy J. Kirven, arguments by Messrs. Bush, Copenhaver, Bussart, Kirven, and P. Hacker for appellants in Case No. 06-74; Michael R. O'Donnell, State's Counsel and Rhonda Sigrist Woodard, Special Assistant Attorney General, argument by Mr. O'Donnell and Ms. Woodard for appellees in Case No. 06-74) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/08/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
06/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authority. Second notice of supplemental authorities.Notice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
06/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authority (response to State's notice)Notice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
01/08/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/24/2008Record - Record returned to district court. Arrangements made by Hickey & Evans, LLP to transport record back to the First Judicial District Court by Interstate Moving.RecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/24/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/31/2008Notice-Incoming - Other. Record return receipt. Record signed for 1/25/08 by First Judicial Clerk of District Court. Record (40 boxes) transported by Interstate Moving.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal