judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THOMAS F. WRIGHT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0750
Short Caption:THOMAS F. WRIGHT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD3054-10Filed Date:06/10/2010

Opening Event Date:06/10/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/04/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/15/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThomas F. Wright Y
Edward E. SchwabYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Edward E. Schwab, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (GP)
06/28/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Edward E. Schwab, Esquire
08/05/2010 On consideration of this court's order of June 28, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (JAC)
08/13/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
08/13/2010RECEIVED - aplt's statement re trancript.
08/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (23pgs/Tape) 5/12/10 proc. w/CD
08/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (Pretrial Services report filed 2/19/10)
08/16/2010RECORD INDEX
08/16/2010RECORD COPIES
08/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/31/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (51pgs/Tape) 5/12/10 proc. w/CD included
09/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
09/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
09/15/2010RECEIVED Appellant's Brief (maxb & malb still pend).
11/02/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 15, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
11/03/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until November 22, 2010 (no oppo)
11/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before November 22, 2010. (By: JAC)
11/22/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until November 24, 2010 (unopposed)
11/29/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo).
11/29/2010RECEIVED Appendix to Appellant's Brief (maxb & malb still pend).
11/29/2010RECEIVED Appellant's Brief (maxb & malb pend).
12/06/2010ORD GRANT APLT MOTIONS and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
12/06/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/06/2010APPENDIX
01/05/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until February 4, 2011
01/27/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before February 4, 2011. (By: JAC)
02/04/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
02/04/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/15/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/15/2011SUBMITTED (Washington, Blackburne-Rigsby, Nebeker)
08/11/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Nebeker, Senior Judge)
09/02/2011FiledMandate