judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GEMMILL VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34710
Short Caption:GEMMILL VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C157957Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/24/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/24/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 99-07878
09/14/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. fn1[In the petition, petitioner seeks a stay of the district court proceedings. We decline to grant a stay at this time]. 99-08672
10/01/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 99-09456
10/11/1999MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Request for leave to file a reply to the Real Parties in Interest's Answer. 99-09812
11/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. " . . . we deny this petition." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11522
12/13/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document.
12/15/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-12624
12/15/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/27/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Recall Notice in Lieu of Remittitur and for Leave to File an Untimely Petition for Rehearing. 99-13229
12/27/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Pursuant to NRAP 40(d).
01/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motions to Recall Notices in Lieu of Remittitur. We are not persuaded that counsel has demonstrated good cause for recalling the notices in lieu of remittitur. We deny petitioners' motion to recall the notices in lieu of the remittitur and for leave to file an untimely petition for rehearing. Nos. 34705, 34710. 00-01281