judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALAN J. VEYS, individually and d/b/a LONE EAGLE RESORTS, INC., an Alaska corporation, and d/b/a PYBUS POINT LODGE, LLC, a Washington limited liability company; and ALAN J. VEYS PROPERTIES, LLC, a Washington limited liability company v. MARVIN N. APPLEQUIST; VAL B. JONES; BRUCE F. REED; and PYBUS ALASKA RESORTS, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company,

Case Heading (06-161)
Case Number:06-161Case Docketed On:07/11/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:ALAN J. VEYS, individually and d/b/a LONE EAGLE RESORTS, INC., an Alaska corporation, and d/b/a PYBUS POINT LODGE, LLC, a Washington limited liability company; and ALAN J. VEYS PROPERTIES, LLC, a Washington limited liability company v. MARVIN N. APPLEQUIST; VAL B. JONES; BRUCE F. REED; and PYBUS ALASKA RESORTS, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company,
Full Title:ALAN J. VEYS, individually and d/b/a LONE EAGLE RESORTS, INC., an Alaska corporation, and d/b/a PYBUS POINT LODGE, LLC, a Washington limited liability company; and ALAN J. VEYS PROPERTIES, LLC, a Washington limited liability company, Appellants (Defendants), v. MARVIN N. APPLEQUIST; VAL B. JONES; BRUCE F. REED; and PYBUS ALASKA RESORTS, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAlan J. VeysLarry B. Jones
Diane Vaksdal-Smith
AppellantLone Eagle Resorts, Inc., an Alaska corporationLarry B. Jones
Diane Vaksdal-Smith
AppellantPybus Point Lodge,LLC, a Washington limited liability companyLarry B. Jones
Diane Vaksdal-Smith
AppellantAlan J. Veys Properties, LLC, a Washington limited liability companyLarry B. Jones
Diane Vaksdal-Smith
AppelleeMarvin N. ApplequistMark W. Gifford
Darin Boyd Scheer
AppelleeVal B. JonesMark W. Gifford
Darin Boyd Scheer
AppelleeBruce F. ReedMark W. Gifford
Darin Boyd Scheer
AppelleePybus Alaska Resorts, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability companyMark W. Gifford
Darin Boyd Scheer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 60
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/11/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/11/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/11/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/24/2006Event - Phone Call from district court clerk, she just received a copy of an order staying proceedings due to bankruptcy filing by appellantEventPhone CallFinal
08/07/2006Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellants re bankruptcy, he is drafting pleading and will sent overnightEventPhone CallFinal
08/08/2006Notice-Incoming - Bankruptcy proceedingNotice-IncomingBankruptcy proceedingFinal
08/17/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantsMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/06/2006Order - Other, Notice of Bankruptcy FilingOrderOtherFinal
09/11/2006Brief - Appellants; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
09/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
09/15/2006Motion - Other leave to file amended brief of appellantsMotionOtherFinal
09/18/2006Order - Granting motion for leave to file amended brief of appellants. Filed amended brief; brief and certificate of service are not signed and dated.OrderGrantFinal
10/26/2006Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
11/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/06/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/07/2006Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellant re due date to file reply brief; recalculated and due date for reply brief adjustedEventPhone CallFinal
11/13/2006Brief - Appellant reply; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/14/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, nine volumes. Volumes I - III, Original Papers; Volumes IV-VIII, Transcripts; Volume IX, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/20/2006Motion - Admission pro hac vice for Diane Vaksdal-Smith to appear on behalf of appellantsMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
11/21/2006Order - Pro hac vice - allowOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
12/14/2006Event - Oral argument presentedEventOral argument presentedFinal
12/14/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before full court (Colin Simpson and Diane Vaksdal Smith, argument by Ms. Smith for appellants; Mark W. Gifford and Darin B. Scheer, argument by Mr. Gifford for appellees) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/13/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/01/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/01/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal