judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEDIST HIRPASSA V. HOWARD UNIVERSITY

Case Information: 10-CV-0751
Short Caption:KEDIST HIRPASSA V. HOWARD UNIVERSITYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 09-CV-1510 Consolidated:10-CV-0751
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB904-10Filed Date:06/08/2010

Opening Event Date:06/08/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/22/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/14/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKedist Hirpassa YPro SeN
AppelleeHoward UniversityN
Marvelle Hall-Mcintyre NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/16/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on June 8, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
07/22/2010RECORD INDEX
07/22/2010RECORD COPIES
07/22/2010RECORD COMPLETED
07/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
09/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (17-pgs/tape 5/21/10 proc.)w/cd attached
09/16/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 9/23/10 **************STRUCK*****/SEE 11/1/10 ORDER (elp)
09/21/2010LETTER - from aple regarding aplt filing under a different name (*Using name Kedist Girma instead of Kedist Hirpassa) (elp)
09/27/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to change case caption LW ************STRUCK******/SEE 11/1/10 ORDER (elp)
11/01/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to supplement the record, supplement to the motion to supplement the record, motions to change case captions, and motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix, and this court's order of June 9, 2010, which directed appellant to properly serve her motions on appellee and to follow the rules of this court regardless of her pro se status, and it appearing that appellant has failed properly serve the motions on appellee's counsel, and appellee's motion to dismiss appeal 09-CV-1510, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 09-CV-1510 and 10-CV-751 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motions to supplement the record, motions to change caption and motion for an extension of time to file the brief are hereby stricken. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's motion to dismiss is hereby denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's consolidated brief and the limited appendix shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. (ETW) elp
12/10/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION TO COMPEL APPELLEE TO CORRECT HER MEDICAL RECORDS.
01/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion to compel to correct her medical records, to which no opposition has been filed, and it appearing that appellant's motion was improperly captioned, and upon further consideration of this court's order of November 1, 2010, which directed appellant to file the brief and the limited appendix, within 40 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion to compel is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall file all subsequent pleadings under the correct case caption as shown above. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
02/07/2011RECEIVED- aplt's brief due on 1/24/11 (motion needed re: 1/3/11 order)
02/08/2011NOTICE SENT - to aplt re: motion for leave to file brief
02/18/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
03/09/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for dismiss appeal, to which no oppostion has been filed, and on further consideration of this court's order of January 3, 2011, which directed appellant to submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time within 20 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that appellee's motion is granted and these appeals are hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
03/09/2011DISMISSED
11/14/2011FiledMandate