Case: A-11733
A-11733
10/17/1966
Application for Writ of Error
ROY D. ATKINS
ROBERT E. CROSLAND
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/16/1967 | Post submission brief filed | Petitioner | | |
01/19/1967 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
01/10/1967 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
11/01/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/17/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/05/1967 | Opinion issued | | ||
03/16/1967 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
01/19/1967 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
01/10/1967 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
11/16/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/01/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/17/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
10/17/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Robert E. Crosland | Respondent | |
Roy D. Atkins | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information