Case: A-11722
A-11722
10/10/1966
Application for Writ of Error
HEMPHILL COUNTY
WALTER ADAMS AND HARRY RATHJEN, LAWYERS SURETY CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/07/1966 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
10/24/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/20/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/10/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/07/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
11/07/1966 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
10/24/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/20/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/10/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
10/10/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Walter Adams and Harry Rathjen | Respondent | |
LAWYERS SURETY CORPORATION | Respondent | |
Hemphill County | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information