Case: 02-04-00104-CV
02-04-00104-CV
04/05/2004
Forcible Detainer
Farhia Gohe
Mayfield Park Apartments
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/02/2008 | Letter received | | |||||
04/14/2005 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
02/03/2005 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
02/02/2005 | Submitted | | |||||
12/03/2004 | Motion for Extension to File Supp. Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
12/02/2004 | Motion for Extension to File Supp. Brief Filed | | |||||
10/26/2004 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
10/25/2004 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||
10/07/2004 | Letter | | |||||
09/23/2004 | Brief Deficient Letter | | |||||
08/26/2004 | Brief Filed | | |||||
07/07/2004 | Letter | | |||||
07/02/2004 | Other Document Received | | |||||
06/23/2004 | Other Document Received | | |||||
06/18/2004 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||||
06/07/2004 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
06/07/2004 | Docketing Statement Not Received | | |||||
06/07/2004 | Clerk's Record Not Received | | |||||
06/07/2004 | Request for Extension of Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/01/2004 | Received Reporter's Record Affidavit or Letter | | |||||
05/24/2004 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||||
05/12/2004 | Unpaid Fee Notices | | |||||
04/16/2004 | Letter | | |||||
04/05/2004 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/14/2005 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Gohe, Farhia | Appellant | Farhia Gohe |
Mayfield Park Apartments | Appellee | Brian S. Holk |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable R. Brent Keis
2004-022410-1