Case: A-11738
A-11738
10/21/1966
Application for Writ of Error
AL SCHULMAN, ET AL.
CITY OF HOUSTON, UNITED COMPOST SERVICES, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/07/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
11/04/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/31/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/21/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/08/1967 | Opinion issued on motion for rehearing | | ||
12/12/1966 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
12/07/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
11/04/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/31/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/21/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
10/21/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
City of Houston | Respondent | |
Al Schulman, et al. | Petitioner | |
United Compost Services, Inc. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information