Case: 03-02-00798-CV
03-02-00798-CV
12/18/2002
Whistle Blower
Patricia Ruiz and Chantell Ruiz
Austin Independent School District, Andy Welch, Principal Darrell Baker, and Coach Lee Thompson
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/15/2012 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||||
08/10/2009 | Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk | | |||||
10/02/2006 | Case stored | | |||||
08/30/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
05/27/2004 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
07/21/2003 | Submitted | | |||||
06/06/2003 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
05/30/2003 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
05/28/2003 | Brief filed | | |||||
05/19/2003 | Record has been checked in-see remarks | | |||||
05/16/2003 | Record checked out - see remarks | | |||||
04/28/2003 | Oral argument waiver received | | |||||
04/28/2003 | Appendix filed | | |||||
04/28/2003 | Brief filed | | |||||
04/24/2003 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
04/24/2003 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
04/15/2003 | Staff recommendation for mediation | No for mediation | | ||||
04/08/2003 | Record has been checked in-see remarks | | |||||
04/01/2003 | Record checked out - see remarks | | |||||
03/13/2003 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
03/12/2003 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
03/11/2003 | Telephone call received by the clerk's office from attorney, clerk or reporter | | |||||
03/11/2003 | Telephone discussion between clerk's office & others | | |||||
02/07/2003 | Telephone discussion between clerk's office & others | | |||||
01/30/2003 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
01/17/2003 | Docketing statement or response | | |||||
01/10/2003 | ADR letter w/docketing statement | | |||||
01/10/2003 | Letter received | | |||||
12/18/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
12/18/2002 | Docketing statement received | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/30/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Welch, Andy | Appellee | Ms. Dorcas A. Green Mr. Eric W. Schulze |
Ruiz, Chantell | Appellant | Mr. Jimmie L. J. Brown Jr. |
Ruiz, Patricia | Appellant | Mr. Jimmie L. J. Brown Jr. |
Coach Lee Thompson | Appellee | Mr. Eric W. Schulze Ms. Dorcas A. Green |
Principal Darrell Baker | Appellee | Ms. Dorcas A. Green Mr. Eric W. Schulze |
Austin Independent School District | Appellee | Mr. Oscar G. Trevino Mr. Eric W. Schulze |
Trial Court Information
98th District Court
Travis
Honorable Scott H. Jenkins
GN201207