Case: A-11741
A-11741
10/25/1966
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS, EX REL. LEE H. LYTTON, JR., COUNTY JUDGE
WILLIAM R. EDWARDS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/14/1966 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
11/09/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
11/03/1966 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
10/25/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/30/1966 | Letter Filed | | ||
11/14/1966 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
11/09/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/03/1966 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
10/25/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Refused | | |
10/25/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
M. A. Shumard, Jr. | Amicus Curiae | |
William R. Edwards | Respondent | |
Title Underwriters of Texas, Inc. | Amicus Curiae | |
State of Texas, ex rel. Lee H. Lytton, Jr., County Judge | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information