Case: A-11731
A-11731
10/17/1966
Application for Writ of Error
EMORY F. VERNON, ET AL.
STATE OF TEXAS, EX REL. CITY OF SAN ANTONIO, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/12/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
12/21/1966 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
11/18/1966 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
10/31/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/17/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/12/1967 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
12/21/1966 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
11/18/1966 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
10/31/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/17/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
10/17/1966 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
S. G. Johndroe, Jr., City Attorney, City of Fort Worth | Amicus Curiae | |
Will Sears and Robert Burns, Special Corporation Counsel for City of Houston | Amicus Curiae | |
State of Texas, ex rel. City of San Antonio, et al. | Respondent | |
Emory F. Vernon, et al. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information