Case: B-4507
B-4507
03/06/1974
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF HOUSTON
SOUTHERN PACIFIC TRANSPORTATION CO.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/24/1974 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
06/12/1974 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
06/10/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
06/04/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
04/15/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/09/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/01/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
03/28/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
03/27/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
03/25/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
03/25/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
03/06/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/24/1974 | Reply to Response | | ||
06/12/1974 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
06/10/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
06/04/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
04/15/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
04/09/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
04/01/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
04/01/1974 | Motion for leave to file brief | | ||
03/28/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
03/27/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
03/25/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
03/25/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
03/25/1974 | Motion for leave to file brief | | ||
03/06/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
03/06/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Atchison, Topeka and Santa Fe, Chicago, Rock Island and Pacific, Lousiana and Arkansas, Missouri-Kansas-Texas, Missouri Pacific, St. Louis-San Francisco, St. Louis Southwestern, Texas and Pacific and Texas Mexican Railway Companies | Amicus Curiae | |
City of Forth Worth | Amicus Curiae | |
Attorneys Committee of the Texas Association of Assessing Officers | Amicus Curiae | |
Committee of the Texas City Attorneys Association | Amicus Curiae | |
City of Dallas | Amicus Curiae | |
HOUSTON I.S.D. | Amicus Curiae | |
City of Tyler, Texas | Amicus Curiae | |
City of Houston | Petitioner | |
Southern Pacific Transportation Co. | Respondent | |
Alex Beall | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information