Case: B-4465
B-4465
02/13/1974
Application for Writ of Error
PRICE ASHTON
TOM BENNETT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/20/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
03/18/1974 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
03/06/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
03/06/1974 | Errata Filed | Petitioner | | |
02/13/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/20/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
03/18/1974 | Reply to Response | | ||
03/06/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
03/06/1974 | Errata Filed | | ||
02/18/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/13/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Price Ashton | Petitioner | |
Tom Bennett, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information